MA H1780 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4651
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure safe maintenance of utility poles and wires. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To ensure safe maintenance of utility poles and wires
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] |
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4651 |
2017-04-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H1749 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2702 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3218 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1660 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H404 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H2946 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1855 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1198 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4149 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4987 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2702 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H3218 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1660 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H404 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H2946 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1855 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1198 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4149 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4987 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1780 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1780.pdf |