MA H1660 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4851

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to state contracting for cleaning, maintenance or security guard services. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to state contracting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-30HouseAmendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
2018-07-30HouseRead third
2018-07-30HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2018-07-30HouseRules suspended
2018-07-30HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2018-07-30HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2018-07-30HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4851
2018-01-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2017-09-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H1685 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4589
S1689 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4589
H3362 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4851 (Replaced by) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback