MA H3396 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4684

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to solar power equity in low-income and environmental justice communities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to solar power equity in low-income and environmental justice communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4684
2018-05-09SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-07HouseReporting date extended to Thursday June 21, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-17HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 26, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-15SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-12HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 12, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 9, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H216 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4406
H1591 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S743 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2344
S1834 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2833 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H666 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1665 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S2373 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4546 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #451 (Yeas 22 to Nays 15)
H4684 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback