MA H2254 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4874

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to filing actions of slander against anonymous parties on the internet. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to filing slander against anonymous parties on the internet

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4874
2017-08-31JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S179 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H3331 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3698 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2053 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
S2062 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback