MA S179 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2485

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the cybersecurity of the Internet of Things and other smart devices. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the cybersecurity of the Internet of Things and other smart devices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2485
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 13, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-07-13JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H3365 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S2485 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback