MA S143 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2357
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to unsolicited loans. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to unsolicited loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2357 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read second |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2357 |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S116 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S127 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S123 (Similar To) 2017-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1845 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H519 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H556 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S127 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S123 (Similar To) 2017-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1845 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H519 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H556 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S143 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S143.pdf |