MA S655 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to unfair and deceptive insurance practices. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to anti-corrupt insurance medical examinations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S671 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1202 (Similar To) 2021-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S658 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S787 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1221 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S628 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S727 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3100 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S661 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2587 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1191 (Similar To) 2021-09-14 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2487 (Similar To) 2021-11-11 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S710 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S709 (Similar To) 2021-08-24 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S634 (Similar To) 2021-10-26 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1290 (Similar To) 2021-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S698 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S629 (Similar To) 2021-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback