MA S698 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2700
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit discrimination in insurance on the basis of having a naloxone prescription. Financial Services.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination in insurance on the basis of having a naloxone prescription
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] |
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2700 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S671 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1202 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S2017 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3100 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
S661 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S710 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S629 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S628 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S688 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S658 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2695 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2700 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S671 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1202 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S2017 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3100 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
S661 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S710 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S629 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S628 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S688 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S658 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2695 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2700 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S698 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S698.pdf |