MA S555 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2318

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to women’s health and cancer recovery. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to women’s health and cancer recovery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2318
2015-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2318 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S467 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S493 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1165 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2313
S2179 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2313 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Committee recommended out to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S406 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4168
S1453 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H1949 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1630 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback