MA S406 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4168

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4168
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to plastic bag reduction. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to plastic bag reduction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4168
2015-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H4168 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S353 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
S359 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H696 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H787 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H3438 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback