MA H1949 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4242

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require restaurants to identify for customers the presence and origin of food allergens contained in the list of products offered by such restaurants. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring identification of food allergens in eating establishments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4242
2015-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback