MA S2443 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend Section 9 of the 1921 City of Lowell Charter. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending Section 9 of the 1921 City of Lowell Charter

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-06-24SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-06-03JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-05-10HouseHouse concurred
2021-05-06SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
H3899 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4259
H3705 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2021
S2449 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2021
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
H3920 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2021
H3925 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H3995 (Similar To) 2021-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2021
H4110 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S352 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H696 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S343 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S831 (Similar To) 2021-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2547
S449 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback