MA S356 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2755

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the net school spending cap. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the net school spending cap

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2755
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H710 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H4110 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S352 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S343 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S2755 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback