MA H3707 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S41

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Everett be authorized to amend the charter of said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the city of Everett home rule charter

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateAccompanied S41
2021-04-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-04-28HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S41 (Replaced by) 2021-05-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2021
H3939 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Senate concurred
H3984 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4274
H4274 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4690 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4779 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback