MA H4995 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 362 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 362 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter of the town of Williamstown. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To amend the town of Williamstown Home Rule Charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 362 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-11-28 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-07-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4994 (Similar To) 2022-12-05 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5409
H3984 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4274
H3939 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H4992 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4993 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4690 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2022
H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
H4274 (Similar To) 2022-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2022
H3984 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4274
H3939 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H4992 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4993 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4690 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2022
H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
H4274 (Similar To) 2022-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4995 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4995.pdf |