MA S831 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter of Wheaton College. Higher Education.
Title
To amend the charter of Wheaton College
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2547 |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
H3899 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4259
S2443 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3705 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2021
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
H3920 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2021
H3925 (Similar To) 2022-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2022
H3995 (Similar To) 2021-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2021
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S352 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S2547 (Replaced by) 2021-12-06 - New draft substituted, see S2592
H696 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S343 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H4274 (Similar To) 2022-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2022
S2592 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2022
H3899 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4259
S2443 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3705 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2021
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
H3920 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2021
H3925 (Similar To) 2022-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2022
H3995 (Similar To) 2021-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2021
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S352 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S2547 (Replaced by) 2021-12-06 - New draft substituted, see S2592
H696 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S343 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H4274 (Similar To) 2022-12-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2022
S2592 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S831 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S831.pdf |