MA S2482 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the town of Sutton Home Rule Charter. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the town of Sutton Home Rule Charter

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-21SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-09-23SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-28HouseHouse concurred
2021-06-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
S2451 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3899 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4259
S2474 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2443 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
H3925 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3948 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
H3995 (Similar To) 2021-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 40 of the Acts of 2021
H4110 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S352 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S356 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S353 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S371 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H696 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S343 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S831 (Similar To) 2021-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2547
H4259 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback