MA H3925 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to amending the charter of the city of Newburyport. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the charter of the city of Newburyport

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2022-01-24SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2022-01-20HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-10-25HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-10-25HouseRules suspended
2021-10-25HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-09-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-06SenateSenate concurred
2021-06-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3899 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4259
H3920 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2021
H3705 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2021
H3792 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4066 (Similar To) 2021-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2021
H3794 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2561 (Similar To) 2021-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 105 of the Acts of 2021
H4259 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback