MA S2561 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 105 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 105 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the charter of the town of North Andover
Title
Amending the charter of the town of North Andover
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 105 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-12-13 | House | Enacted |
2021-12-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-11-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-11-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-10-25 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2497 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Tarr) for S2497 |
Same As/Similar To
S1330 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H2190
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2498 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2022
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
H3792 (Similar To) 2022-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 348 of the Acts of 2022
H4259 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2022
H5370 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 408 of the Acts of 2022
H3747 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2022
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2498 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2022
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
H3792 (Similar To) 2022-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 348 of the Acts of 2022
H4259 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2022
H5370 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 408 of the Acts of 2022
H3747 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2561 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2561.pdf |