MA S2206 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Accompanied S1234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Accompanied S1234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to childhood lead poisoning prevention. Public Health.
Title
Relative to childhood lead poisoning prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Accompanied S1234 |
2020-02-10 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-04-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
H3302 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
H328 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3433 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S1234 (Replaced by) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
H3302 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
H328 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3433 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S1234 (Replaced by) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2206 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2206.pdf |