MA H3302 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to information provided to victims of abuse. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to abuse prevention
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3330 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1159 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H223 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1885 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4444
H2039 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S518 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S180 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S316 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1864 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H564 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4642
H3415 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3418 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1457 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H4043 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
S2329 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2019
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1159 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H223 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1885 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4444
H2039 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S518 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S180 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S316 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1864 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H564 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4642
H3415 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3418 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1457 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H4043 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
S2329 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2019
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3302 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3302.pdf |