MA S180 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2534
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the security of personal financial information. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the security of personal financial information
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] |
Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2534 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1113 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H3351 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2375 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S999 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3567
H1357 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1973 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1406 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3351 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2375 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S999 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3567
H1357 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1973 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1406 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S180 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S180.pdf |