MA S2301 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2319

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Marilyn O’Neil, an employee of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Marilyn O’Neil, an employee of the Executive Office of Public Safety and Security

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
2019-08-12SenateAgain enacted and again laid before the Governor
2019-08-12SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-08-12HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-08-12SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2019-08-12SenateRules suspended
2019-08-12HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendments with a further amendment
2019-08-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2019-08-12SenateGovernor's amendment adopted
2019-08-12SenateRules suspended
2019-08-09SenateGovernor returned to Senate with amendment, see S2319
2019-08-08SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-08-08HouseEnacted
2019-08-08SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-08-08HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-08-08HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third, and passed to be engrossed
2019-08-08HouseRules suspended
2019-08-08HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-07-30HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-07-29SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-07-29SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-07-22SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-07-22SenateRules suspended
2019-07-22SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2019-07-18HouseHouse concurred
2019-06-13SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2019-06-13SenateRules suspended
2019-06-10SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H3849 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2019
H3952 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3816 (Similar To) 2019-06-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3913 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2019
H3914 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2019
S2315 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2019
S2319 (Replaced by) 2019-08-12 - See S2301
H4064 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2019
S5 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2019
S6 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2019
H3578 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
H2263 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H4151 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2019
H4156 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback