MA S2227 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to child predators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to child predators

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2019-11-25JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-05-29HouseHouse concurred
2019-05-28SenateRead and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3476 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H132 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2118 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H328 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3433 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S497 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback