MA S2294 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SENATE, July 18, 2019 - The committee on Ways and Means to whom was referred the Senate Bill to end child marriage in Massachusetts (Senate, No. 24),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2294).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To end child marriage in Massachusetts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-25 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #87 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-25 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #86 (Y: 12 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-29HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-07-25SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #87 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0)
2019-07-25SenateRead third (title changed)
2019-07-25SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-07-25SenateAmendment #1 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #86 (Yeas 12 to Nays 27)
2019-07-25SenateSubstituted as a new draft for S24
2019-07-18SenateRecommended new draft for S24
2019-07-18SenateReported form the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
H3983 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2313 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
H1548 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2888
H328 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1340 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2397 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2409
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback