MA H332 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing consumers with protections from vendors providing retail sales or services in spaces other than fixed building sites. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing security to consumers for purchases from certain vendors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28JointHearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H258 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H54 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1628 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3695
H957 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1936 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S120 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S185 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3695 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3966 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback