MA H3695 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1628

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to social media privacy protection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to social media privacy protection

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-04-25HouseNew draft of H1628
2019-04-25HouseReported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H1628 (Replaces) 2019-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3695
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S185 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H332 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H3966 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback