MA H1628 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3695

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to social media consumer privacy protection. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to social media privacy protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3695
2019-04-02JointHearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H54 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H957 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H965 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1
H332 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S120 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1936 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S185 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3695 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3966 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback