MA S120 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2534

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to consumer data privacy. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to consumer data privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2534
2019-09-23JointHearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S295 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3148 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S822 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1386 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S905 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback