MA H957 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to non-contracted and non-emergency healthcare billing. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect consumers from surprise billing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H54 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1628 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3695
H982 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H124 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H965 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1
H332 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1936 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S120 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S185 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3966 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback