MA H965 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reporting of credit transactions of consumers by financial or consumer lending institutions following bankruptcies. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to consumer protection following a bankruptcy
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1628 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3695
H957 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1094 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3695 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1628 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3695
H957 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1094 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3695 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H965 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H965.pdf |