MA S2397 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S2409

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reprinted as amended, see S2409
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to pharmaceutical access, costs and transparency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pharmaceutical access, costs and transparency

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #129 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #127 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #126 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #125 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #124 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14SenateReprinted as amended, see S2409
2019-11-14SenateRead third
2019-11-14SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-14SenateSubstituted, as amended, for S733
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #43 (Rodrigues) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #30 (Montigny) adopted - see Roll Call #127 [39 YEAS to 0 NAY]
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #24 (Welch) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #15 (Tran) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #4 (DiZoglio) adopted - see Roll Call #126 [39 YEAS to 0 NAY]
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #33 (Tarr) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #22 (Creem) adopted - see Roll Call #125 [39 YEAS to 0 NAY]
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #28 (Eldridge) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #17 (Lesser) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #3 (Lesser) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #14 (Chandler) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #42 (Montigny) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #37 (Fattman) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #34 (Tarr) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #31 (Tarr) adopted - see Roll Call #124 [38 YEAS to 1 NAY]
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #27 (Lewis) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #21 (Cyr) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #19 (DiZoglio) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #16 (Tran) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #12 (Cyr) adopted
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #10 (Lesser) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #6 (Kennedy) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #2 (Lesser) rejected
2019-11-14SenateAmendment #1 (Keenan) rejected
2019-11-07SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, November 14, 2019
2019-11-07SenateRecommended new draft for S733
2019-11-07SenateReported form the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H332 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1936 (Similar To) 2019-10-09 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S552 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H54 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1310 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1931 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S2409 (Replaces) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback