MA H3974 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4073

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the excise on certain rooms located within municipalities that are members of the Cape Cod and Islands Water Protection Fund. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making technical corrective changes to the cape cod and islands water protection fund tax assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-16HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4073
2019-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-07-16SenateSenate concurred
2019-07-12HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3628 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3896 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H4073 (Replaced by) 2020-09-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback