MA H4073 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making technical corrective changes to the Cape Cod and Islands Water Protection Fund tax assessments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making technical corrective changes to the Cape Cod and Islands Water Protection Fund tax assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2020
2020-09-17SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-09-17HouseEnacted
2020-09-14SenateSenate concurred in the further House amendment
2020-09-14SenateRules suspended
2020-09-08HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, striking all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of House document numbered 4969
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-07-29SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-07-29SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-07-29SenateAmended (Cyr) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2851
2020-07-29SenateRead second
2020-07-29SenateRules suspended
2020-07-29SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-09-30SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2019-09-26HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-09-19HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-09-19HouseRules suspended
2019-09-19HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-09-16HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-09-16HouseNew draft of H3974
2019-09-16HouseReported from the committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H3628 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3896 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback