MA H3896 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4546

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to financial assistance to the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority from cities and towns. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring fairness in local MBTA assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4546
2019-11-21JointHearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-06-13SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3628 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H2343 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H341 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H254 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback