NY S00154 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires lithium-ion batteries sold in this state to be manufactured in accordance with certain standards and specifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires lithium-ion batteries sold in this state to be manufactured in accordance with certain standards and specifications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.656
2023-04-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 154B
2023-04-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2023-02-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 154A
2023-02-21SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A04938 (Same As) 2023-04-11 - print number 4938a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback