MA H2343 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2168
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement benefits for certain employees of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Relative to ensure fairness for certain employees of the department of corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied by H2168 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1602 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2449 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1105 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2503 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H2168 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2343
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2449 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1105 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2503 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H2168 (Replaces) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2343
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2343 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2343.pdf |