MA H2449 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5031
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing tax credits to certain employers that provide on-site child-care for employees. Revenue.
Title
Providing tax credits to certain employers that provide affordable, on-site child-care for employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5031 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1602 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2561 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1105 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2503 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5031 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1626 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2561 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1105 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2503 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H5031 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2449 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2449.pdf |