MA H3628 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4546

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to improve fairness in local Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority tax assessments. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission to improve fairness in local Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority tax assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4546
2019-11-21JointHearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H3303 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3896 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5032
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2446 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback