MA H132 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5088

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to at-risk children and their proper placement. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring the appropriate and timely payment and residential service placement for children deemed to be a safety risk

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-04HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5088
2019-08-26JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H328 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H403 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3435 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3390 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
H5088 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback