MA S1884 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2387

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to distinctive registration plates. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to distinctive registration plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2387
2015-11-24JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2387 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2244 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2016
S932 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S801 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S977 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S991 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S828 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1163 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
S713 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1670 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback