IL HB4653 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Effective Date January 1, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Effective Date January 1, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes stylistic changes in provisions concerning institutes or inservice training workshops. In provisions concerning inservice training programs, removes the requirement that the training regarding health conditions of students include the chronic health conditions of students and provides that school district employees who are trained to respond to trauma under the provisions shall be immune from civil liability in the use of a trauma kit unless the action constitutes willful or wanton misconduct. Provides that training regarding the implementation of trauma-informed practices under the provisions concerning institutes or inservice training workshops satisfies the requirements under the provisions concerning inservice training programs. Removes certain provisions that require a school board to conduct inservice training for all school district employees on the methods to respond to trauma. Makes technical changes having a revisory function. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
SCH CD-EMPLOYE TRAUMA TRAINING
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-07-01 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0603 |
2024-07-01 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-011-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-001-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |