NJ A2294 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5736
Note: Carry Over of previous S4117
Note: Carry Over of previous S4117
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes mortgage payment relief and foreclosure protection for certain homeowners impacted by the remnants of Hurricane Ida.
Title
Establishes mortgage payment relief and foreclosure protection for certain homeowners impacted by the remnants of Hurricane Ida.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0) |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5736 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S4117 (Carry Over) 2024-01-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1443 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4117 (Carry Over) 2024-01-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1443 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee