CA SB1490 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22598, 22599, and 22599.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to food delivery.
Title
Food delivery platforms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & E. D. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22598 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22599 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22599.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |