CA SB336 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 17.5 (commencing with Section 8900) to Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State grant programs: negotiated indirect cost rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB336 Umberg Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Assembly - SB 336 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Stephanie Nguyen (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Assembly - SB 336 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Stephanie Nguyen (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB336 Umberg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-29SenateIn Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2024-09-29SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2024-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2024-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5727.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6889.) Ordered to the Senate.
2024-08-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-22AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-08-22AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 69 suspended.
2024-08-22 Action rescinded whereby bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
2024-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2024-08-22SenateOrdered to the Assembly.
2024-08-20SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-08-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6378.) Ordered to the Senate.
2024-08-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-06AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2024-08-05AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen.
2023-09-11AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2023-07-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5).
2023-06-30AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2023-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2023-06-21AssemblyJune 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1298.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1166.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-04-10SenateApril 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2023-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 340.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-02-28SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2023-02-15SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2023-02-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
2023-02-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8900New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336#93ENR
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB336

Bill Comments

feedback