MA S1611 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2548
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support residents and communities in resolving tax debt. Revenue.
Title
Supporting residents and communities in resolving tax debt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Accompanied H2548 |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1687 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2877 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H829 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4096 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
H2548 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1687 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2877 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H829 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4096 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
H2548 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1611 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1611.pdf |