MA H183 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the micro and minority business strategy committee to develop strategies for supporting micro businesses in inner city communities. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to the development of a strategy supporting micro businesses in inner city communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-06-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H183 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H183.pdf |