MA H184 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to state grants targeting minority communities. Community Development and Small Businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to state grants targeting minority communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
2019-10-01JointHearing scheduled for 10/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses

Same As/Similar To

H1755 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4120
H4120 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback