MA H4096 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4784
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an immunization program within the Department of Public Health for certain child care centers, schools, camps and institutions of higher education. Public Health.
Title
Promoting community immunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4784 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 11:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-09-23 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3359 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3360 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H4784 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3359 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3360 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H4784 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4096 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4096.pdf |