MA H2072 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to non-resident firearm licensing. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to non-resident firearm licensing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-22JointHearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-08-08JointHearing scheduled for 08/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1420 (Similar To) 2019-08-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1422 (Similar To) 2019-08-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2144 (Similar To) 2019-08-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback